MN HF1138 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Digital fair repair provided.
Title
Digital fair repair provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Long and Bernardy |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Noor |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Author stricken Davids |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Pinto |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1077 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Author added Dibble