MN HF1124 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School health services modified to allow for the use of private clinical nursing services, use of functional behavioral assessment modified, and students allowed to participate in alternative delivery of specialized instructional services programs.
Title
School health services modified to allow for the use of private clinical nursing services, use of functional behavioral assessment modified, and students allowed to participate in alternative delivery of specialized instructional services programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Keeler |
2021-03-08 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Policy |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF859 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Author added Koran