MN HF111 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression
Action: 2009-05-16 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Divestment required from certain investments relating to Iran.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Divestment required from certain investments relating to Iran.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-16 Governor approval
2009-05-16 Governor's action Approval
2009-05-13 House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
2009-05-13 House: Third reading as amended by the Senate
2009-05-13 House: Motion prevailed
2009-05-13 House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments
2009-05-13 House: Returned from Senate with amendment
2009-05-13 Senate: House concurred and repassed bill
2009-05-11 Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed
2009-05-08 Senate: General Orders: To pass
2009-05-04 Senate: Second reading
2009-05-04 Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended
2009-04-27 Senate: Introduction and first reading
2009-04-27 Senate: Received from House
2009-04-27 Senate: Referred to Finance
2009-04-25 House: Bill was passed
2009-04-25 House: Third reading
2009-04-16 House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
2009-03-24 House: Second reading
2009-03-24 House: Committee report, to pass as amended
2009-03-18 House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance
2009-03-16 House: Motion prevailed
2009-03-16 House: Motion to re-refer Finance
2009-03-16 House: Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2009-02-05 House: Second reading
2009-02-05 House: Committee report, to pass as amended
2009-01-26 House: Author added Murphy, E.
2009-01-22 House: Authors added Gardner, Hoppe and Morgan
2009-01-15 House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback