MN HF1104 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Employer retaliation provisions modified, and pregnancy accommodations modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employer retaliation provisions modified, and pregnancy accommodations modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Robbins - AMENDMENT - H1104A12 (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Neu Brindley - AMENDMENT - H1104A16 (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Neu Brindley - AMENDMENT - H1104A9 (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14SenateSecond reading
2023-03-14SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1018
2023-03-13SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1018, now on General Orders
2023-03-13SenateIntroduction and first reading
2023-03-13SenateReceived from House
2023-03-13HouseAuthor added Her
2023-03-09HouseBill was passed as amended
2023-03-09HouseThird reading as amended
2023-03-09HouseAmendments offered
2023-03-09HousePoint of order raised, ruled not well taken
2023-03-09HouseAmended
2023-03-08HouseAuthor added Kotyza-Witthuhn
2023-02-13HouseSecond reading
2023-02-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2023-02-08HouseAuthor added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
2023-02-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy
2022-03-08HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 9, 2023

Same As/Similar To

SF1018 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1104, SF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback