MN HF1102 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Rasmusson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Rasmusson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home and community-based waiver assessment requirements modified for people temporarily entering health care facilities.
Title
Home and community-based waiver assessment requirements modified for people temporarily entering health care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] | Rep. Luke Frederick [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-11 | House | Authors added Fischer and Long |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Franke, Moller |
2021-03-03 | House | Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1075 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Second reading