MN HF11 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 8:00 am in 120 State Capitol
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Earned sick and safe time provided, rulemaking authorized, civil penalties imposed, and reports required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned sick and safe time provided, rulemaking authorized, civil penalties imposed, and reports required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-03-07HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-01-14HouseAuthor added Youakim
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor

Same As/Similar To

SF1597 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback