MN HF1099 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Day training and habilitation provider grants funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Day training and habilitation provider grants funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1221 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy