MN HF1094 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Tenants provided with right to repair violations in a residential rental unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tenants provided with right to repair violations in a residential rental unit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2024-03-07HouseAuthor added Hassan
2024-02-26HouseAuthor added Fischer
2023-01-30HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2448 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback