MN HF1092 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Richardson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Richardson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Girl Scouts River Valley ConnectZ program grant funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Girl Scouts River Valley ConnectZ program grant funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Richardson |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-18 | House | Authors added Franke and Becker-Finn |
2021-03-17 | House | Authors added Moller, Elkins, Christensen and Hamilton |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Her |
2021-03-11 | House | Authors added Jurgens; Hansen, R., and Freiberg |
2021-03-10 | House | Authors added Huot, Wolgamott, Klevorn and Stephenson |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Theis |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Youakim, Vang, Feist and Pryor |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2043 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Author added Franzen