MN HF1088 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Olson
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Olson
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth job skills and career development funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Youth job skills and career development funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF916 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy