MN HF1081 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prekindergarten through grade 12 provisions modified including general education, education excellence, teachers, charter schools, special education, health, safety, nutrition, libraries, facilities, and state agencies; and report required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prekindergarten through grade 12 provisions modified including general education, education excellence, teachers, charter schools, special education, health, safety, nutrition, libraries, facilities, and state agencies; and report required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
2021-03-15HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
2021-02-15HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1662 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback