MN HF1079 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Senate conferees Ruud; Weber; Senjem; Lang; Hawj
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Senate conferees Ruud; Weber; Senjem; Lang; Hawj
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus legacy bill.
Title
Omnibus legacy bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 79 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 79 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate conferees Ruud; Weber; Senjem; Lang; Hawj |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House conferees Lillie; Jordan; Xiong, J.; Huot; Green |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-26 | House | Senate conferees Ruud; Weber; Senjem; Lang; Hawj |
2021-04-26 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2021-04-22 | House | House conferees Lillie; Jordan; Xiong, J.; Huot; Green |
2021-04-21 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF971 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF971 now on General Orders |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-04-16 | House | Author added Hansen, R. |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-15 | House | Amended |
2021-04-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF971 (Similar To) 2021-04-19 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1079