MN HF1077 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Greater Minnesota business development public infrastructure grant program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Greater Minnesota business development public infrastructure grant program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF535 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Capital Investment