MN HF1074 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Economic Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Economic Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Initiative Foundations funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Initiative Foundations funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
2023-02-16 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; and Perryman |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1611 (Similar To) 2023-02-13 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Development