MN HF1071 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing infrastructure bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing infrastructure bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Mariani |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Her |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1908 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Referred to Capital Investment