MN HF1068 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dependent care credit modified.
Title
Dependent care credit modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Hortman. |
2017-03-13 | House | Authors added Hilstrom, Koegel, and Pryor. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Davids. |
2017-02-15 | House | Authors added Bly and Dehn, R. |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |