MN HF1065 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Acomb
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Acomb
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Neighborhood Development Center grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Neighborhood Development Center grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Acomb |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Feist |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF804 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Development