MN HF1065 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Senate conferees Chamberlain; Eichorn; Duckworth: Dornink; Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus education finance bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus education finance bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 73 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 0 - Amendment to Drazkowski Amendment - Nays (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Erickson Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 67 - Amendment to Erickson Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 70 - Amendment to Erickson Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateSenate conferees Chamberlain; Eichorn; Duckworth: Dornink; Wiger
2021-04-26SenateSenate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
2021-04-26SenateHouse conferees Davnie; Richardson; Pryor; Hassan; Kresha
2021-04-26SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2021-04-26HouseSenate conferees Chamberlain; Eichorn; Duckworth; Dornink; Wiger
2021-04-26HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
2021-04-22HouseHouse conferees Davnie, Richardson, Pryor, Hassan, Kresha
2021-04-22HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2021-04-22HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2021-04-22SenateThird reading Passed
2021-04-22SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading
2021-04-21SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF960
2021-04-20SenateReferred to Rules and Administration forr comparison with SF960
2021-04-20SenateIntroduction and first reading
2021-04-20SenateReceived from House
2021-04-19HouseBill was passed as amended
2021-04-19HouseThird reading as amended
2021-04-19HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken multiple points of order
2021-04-19HouseAmended
2021-04-16HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 19, 2021
2021-04-15HouseSecond reading
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2021-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF960 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1065

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1065&ssn=0&y=2021
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1065&version=0&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1065&version=1&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1065&version=2&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1065&version=3&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=161
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=162
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=163
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=164
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=165
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=166
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=167
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=168
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=169
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=170
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=171
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=172
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=173
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=174
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=176
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=177
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF1065&session_number=0&year=2021&id=175
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage?session=ls92&number=3062

Bill Comments

feedback