MN HF1065 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revisor's bill; miscellaneous technical corrections made to laws and statutes; erroneous, obsolete, and omitted text and references corrected; and redundant, conflicting, and superseded provisions removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revisor's bill; miscellaneous technical corrections made to laws and statutes; erroneous, obsolete, and omitted text and references corrected; and redundant, conflicting, and superseded provisions removed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Secretary of State Chapter 50
2019-05-22 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-22 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-05-22 Governor approval
2019-05-22 Presented to Governor
2019-05-19HouseReturned from Senate
2019-05-19SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-19SenateSpecial Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
2019-05-16SenateSecond reading
2019-05-16SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1290
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1290, now on General Orders
2019-05-15SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-15SenateReceived from House
2019-05-15HouseBill was passed
2019-05-15HouseThird reading
2019-05-13HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 15, 2019
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-11HouseMotion prevailed
2019-03-11HouseMotion to re-refer Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-25HouseSecond reading
2019-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1290 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1065

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback