MN HF1061 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drivers' license suspension by the commissioner of public safety authority modified, retroactive driver's license reinstatement provided, technical changes made, and report required.
Title
Drivers' license suspension by the commissioner of public safety authority modified, retroactive driver's license reinstatement provided, technical changes made, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Dehn |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Baker |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-03-07 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-03-07 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Hassan |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added McDonald |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1376 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy