MN HF1060 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Elkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal and traffic surcharge reduction or waiver authorized; courts required to consider indigency or hardship before imposing fines, fees, or surcharges; and notice required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal and traffic surcharge reduction or waiver authorized; courts required to consider indigency or hardship before imposing fines, fees, or surcharges; and notice required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Elkins
2019-03-05HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-27HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Hassan
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added McDonald
2019-02-14HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1375 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback