MN HF1058 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Litigation proceeds required to be appropriated to commissioner of health and used for tobacco use prevention activities, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Litigation proceeds required to be appropriated to commissioner of health and used for tobacco use prevention activities, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Christensen
2019-02-28HouseAuthors added Noor and Moran
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1029 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Author added Latz

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback