MN HF1055 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officers who have sexual relations with persons in custody criminal penalties established.
Title
Peace officers who have sexual relations with persons in custody criminal penalties established.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2678 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy