MN HF1050 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child foster care and background studies governing provisions modified.
Title
Child foster care and background studies governing provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-07 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2020-05-06 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Albright |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1217 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy