MN HF105 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; executive order relating to use of telemedicine in the state medical cannabis program extended, human services program waivers and modifications issued by the commissioner of human services pursuant to executive orders during the peacetime emergency extended, 60-day period to transition affected programs off waivers and modifications following expiration of the peacetime emergency, and money appropriated.
Title
COVID-19; executive order relating to use of telemedicine in the state medical cannabis program extended, human services program waivers and modifications issued by the commissioner of human services pursuant to executive orders during the peacetime emergency extended, 60-day period to transition affected programs off waivers and modifications following expiration of the peacetime emergency, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 7 | |
2020-06-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-06-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-06-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2020-06-19 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2020-06-18 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-06-18 | House | Third reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-06-18 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-06-18 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-06-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF99 (Similar To) 2020-06-16 - Laid on table