MN HF1049 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mobile food shelf grant program established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile food shelf grant program established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Acomb, Hassan, and Kunesh-Podein
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Moran
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF356 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback