MN HF1048 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth intervention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Youth intervention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF872 (Similar To) 2023-01-27 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety