MN HF1046 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medical assistance income limit for elderly, blind, or disabled persons increase phased in.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance income limit for elderly, blind, or disabled persons increase phased in.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Masin
2019-03-25HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-25HouseReferred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1140 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback