MN HF1043 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Task Force on Disability Services Accessibility and pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Task Force on Disability Services Accessibility and pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Hicks [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
Rep. Brion Curran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-02-09 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2972 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Human Services