MN HF1043 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Author added Lillie.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Author added Lillie.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard-of-Hearing Minnesotans funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Commission on Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard-of-Hearing Minnesotans funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-02-13 | House | Authors added Thies, Nelson, and Daniels. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF948 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy