MN HF1037 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative approval of housing incentives and allocations by the Metropolitan Council required.
Title
Legislative approval of housing incentives and allocations by the Metropolitan Council required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Second reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-03-16 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-03-06 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2017-02-13 | House | Authors added Pugh and Koznick. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |