MN HF1033 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Author added Her
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Author added Her
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Optometry required to establish scope of practice for optometrists.
Title
Board of Optometry required to establish scope of practice for optometrists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Author added Her |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Baker and Schomacker |
2023-02-16 | House | Authors added Elkins, Hollins, and Gillman |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2023-02-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Robbins |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Daniels |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1761 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Author added Hoffman