MN HF103 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Author added Howard
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Author added Howard
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licensing requirements related to diabetes mellitus repealed.
Title
Driver licensing requirements related to diabetes mellitus repealed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF427 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy