MN HF1024 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sauk Centre and Alexandria; I-94 portion designated as Kenneth E. Sellon and Eugene B. Schlotfeldt Memorial Highway.
Title
Sauk Centre and Alexandria; I-94 portion designated as Kenneth E. Sellon and Eugene B. Schlotfeldt Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-26 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF935 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Second reading