MN HF1020 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Emerging Adulthood Task Force created.
Title
Emerging Adulthood Task Force created.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Thomas Huntley [D] |
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health and Human Services Finance |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Government Operations |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood and Youth Development Policy |