MN HF1019 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Civil actions; causes of action survival modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions; causes of action survival modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - House - House: Passage (Y: 77 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17SenateSecond reading
2023-04-17SenateComm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF997
2023-04-14SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF997, now on General Orders
2023-04-14SenateIntroduction and first reading
2023-04-14SenateReceived from House
2023-04-13HouseBill was passed
2023-04-13HouseThird reading
2023-04-12HouseAuthor added Stephenson
2023-04-11HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 13, 2023
2023-03-20HouseSecond reading
2023-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2023-03-16HouseAuthor added Grossell
2023-01-30HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Same As/Similar To

SF997 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1019, SF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback