MN HF1015 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Rasmusson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Rasmusson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Building Code applicability and fire sprinkler requirements modified for public places of accommodation.
Title
State Building Code applicability and fire sprinkler requirements modified for public places of accommodation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2021-04-13 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-13 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF524 |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Haley, Dettmer |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF524 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Second reading