MN HF1013 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-23 - Division action, return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-23 - Division action, return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Full-service community schools grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Full-service community schools grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Youakim |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF37 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy