MN HF1012 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Displaced homemaker programs funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Displaced homemaker programs funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Moran
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Sundin
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1369 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback