MN HF1012 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Displaced homemaker programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Displaced homemaker programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Sundin |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1369 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy