MN HF1011 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Family planning grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family planning grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Schultz
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Long
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Pryor
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Noor
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1293 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback