MN HF1007 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lead safe homes grant program created, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lead safe homes grant program created, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAuthor added Brand
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Vang
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1798 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Author added Dziedzic

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback