MN HF1000 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Traditional and gestational surrogacy arrangements regulated, and operation of a for-profit surrogacy agency crime created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traditional and gestational surrogacy arrangements regulated, and operation of a for-profit surrogacy agency crime created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Koznick
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Lucero
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Robbins
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Heintzeman
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Davids, Nornes, Hamilton, McDonald, and Albright
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Sandstede
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1152 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author added Jensen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback