MN HF1 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public safety; various provision modified including a law enforcement citizen oversight council establishment required, data collection and analysis on peace officer complaints created, Police-Community Relations Council established, peace officer duty to report excessive force incidents established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety; various provision modified including a law enforcement citizen oversight council establishment required, data collection and analysis on peace officer complaints created, Police-Community Relations Council established, peace officer duty to report excessive force incidents established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-20 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 102 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - House - House: 71 - Amendment to the Mariani Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23 Secretary of State Chapter 1
2020-07-23 Governor's action Approval
2020-07-23 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-07-21 Presented to Governor
2020-07-21SenateThird reading Passed
2020-07-21SenateSecond reading
2020-07-20SenateUrgency declared rules suspended
2020-07-20SenateIntroduction and first reading
2020-07-20SenateReceived from House
2020-07-20HouseAuthors added Freiberg, Bernardy, Sandell, Christensen, Hansen, Noor, and Cantrell
2020-07-20HouseBill was passed as amended
2020-07-20HouseThird reading as amended
2020-07-20HouseAmended
2020-07-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, July 20, 2020
2020-07-14HouseAuthors added Becker-Finn, Richardson, Moller, Moran, and Mann
2020-07-14HouseSecond reading
2020-07-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2020-07-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF37 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Author added Relph

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback