MN HF1 | 2017 | 90th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus tax bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus tax bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 95 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed as amended (Y: 25 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 102 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 48 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 45 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 43 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 48 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House: Declare an Urgency Rules Suspension (Y: 110 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Secretary of State Chapter 1
2017-05-30 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-26 Presented to Governor
2017-05-25HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 95-29
2017-05-25HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2017-05-25HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-25HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2017-05-25HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurred and repassed bill
2017-05-24SenateThird reading Passed as amended vote: 44-20
2017-05-24SenateTaken from table
2017-05-23SenateLaid on table
2017-05-23SenateTaken from table
2017-05-23SenateLaid on table
2017-05-23SenateSecond reading
2017-05-23SenateUrgency declared rules suspended
2017-05-23SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-23SenateReceived from House
2017-05-23HouseBill was passed vote: 102-31
2017-05-23HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-23HouseMotion to take from table
2017-05-23HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-23HouseMotion to lay on the table
2017-05-23HouseThird reading
2017-05-23HouseAmendments offered
2017-05-23HouseSecond reading
2017-05-23HouseRules suspended, urgency declared vote: 110-22
2017-05-23HouseIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0001&ssn=1&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=232
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=234
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=235
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=236
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=237
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=238
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0001&session_number=1&year=2017&id=244
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&number=26

Bill Comments

feedback