MI SCR0027 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to encourage the Michigan Department of Natural Resources to establish a Water Trails Grant Program to support Michigan's water trails.
Title
A concurrent resolution to encourage the Michigan Department of Natural Resources to establish a Water Trails Grant Program to support Michigan's water trails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-11-28 | House | Received In House |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |