MI SCR0009 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred To Secretary For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred To Secretary For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge the President and Congress of the United States to explore and support policies that will lead to the establishment of facilities within the United States for the reprocessing and recycling of spent nuclear fuel.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge the President and Congress of the United States to explore and support policies that will lead to the establishment of facilities within the United States for the reprocessing and recycling of spent nuclear fuel.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred To Secretary For Record |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Concurrence Received |
2017-04-19 | House | Adopted And Returned |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2017-03-09 | House | Received In House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |