MI SCR0009 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Military And Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Military And Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge the U.S. Department of Defense, Missile Defense Agency to select the Fort Custer Training Center as the location for a new ground-based interceptor ballistic missile defense mission.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge the U.S. Department of Defense, Missile Defense Agency to select the Fort Custer Training Center as the location for a new ground-based interceptor ballistic missile defense mission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2015-05-12 | House | Received In House |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |