MI SB1527 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 335'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 335'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; limitation; definition of property tax limitation for current year; update. Amends sec. 5i of 1933 PA 62 (MCL 211.205i).
Title
Property tax; limitation; definition of property tax limitation for current year; update. Amends sec. 5i of 1933 PA 62 (MCL 211.205i).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 335'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 12:40 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 11:48 Am | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/17/2010 @ 2:20 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-03 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 Yeas 74 Nays 21 | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-12-03 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-12-03 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-12-01 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2010-11-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-09 | Received On 11/09/2010 | |
2010-11-09 | Passed Roll Call # 515 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-11-04 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-11-04 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-09-29 | Rules Suspended |
Same As/Similar To
HB6411 (Same As) 2010-09-08 - Printed Bill Filed 09/02/2010