MI SB1487 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0288'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0288'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; eligible property included in a plan amendment; clarify. Amends sec. 13 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2663).
Title
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; eligible property included in a plan amendment; clarify. Amends sec. 13 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2663).
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] | Sen. James Barcia [D] | Sen. Hansen Clarke [D] | Sen. Tupac Hunter [D] |
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Tony Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0288'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/16/2010 @ 11:56 Am | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/16/2010 @ 10:30 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:07 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-11-30 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-11-30 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-11-30 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 496 Yeas 97 Nays 6 | |
2010-11-30 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-29 | Received On 09/29/2010 | |
2010-09-29 | Passed Roll Call # 485 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-28 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-28 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-09-28 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-23 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-23 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-23 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-14 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |